Financial history MEDWAY AND MAIDSTONE ATHLETIC CLUB

Charity number: 1127057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £34.50k £23.07k £34.26k £33.46k £41.50k
Total expenditure £38.57k £15.99k £23.49k £42.72k £36.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A