Financial history NOOR AID

Charity number: 1127363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £363.18k £422.95k £520.28k £551.72k £593.39k
Total expenditure £358.12k £424.41k £499.53k £532.65k £625.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £520.28k £551.72k £593.39k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £497.70k £527.89k £622.27k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £300 £300 £420
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £1.83k £4.76k £3.55k