Accounts and annual returns SPRINGBOARD LEARNING CENTRE

Charity number: 1126897
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2010 21 April 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 18 April 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2009 21 May 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 21 May 2010 On Time