Accounts and annual returns YORKSHIRE AND THE HUMBER REGIONAL FORUM LIMITED

Charity Number: 1127119
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 23 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 27 November 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 14 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 13 October 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 21 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 21 October 2013 On Time