Accounts and annual returns KING TACKIE TAWIAH III FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1129658
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2011 12 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2010 02 March 2011 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2010 Not Required