Accounts and annual returns NICHIREN SHOSHU BUDDHIST ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1127244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 June 2024 05 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 27 June 2023 12 June 2024 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 27 June 2022 19 July 2023 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 08 December 2021 04 November 2022 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 December 2021 04 November 2022 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 08 December 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 December 2020 Not Required