Financial history JO MARTIN CANCER CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1127480
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £12.56k £13.03k £12.50k £28.01k £12.50k
Total expenditure £11.06k £12.06k £14.06k £23.07k £22.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A