Trustees North Wales Rivers Trust Ltd
Charity number: 1127415

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Nathali Fenner | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Ferguson | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nigel James Milner | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard White | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan James Winstone | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN WHITE | Trustee | 17 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROGER THOMAS | Trustee | 17 August 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.