Accounts and annual returns THE BALFOUR BEATTY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1127453
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 November 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 November 2021 30 days late
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 August 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 August 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 October 2018 On Time