Financial history THE DUKE OF LANCASTER HOUSING TRUST

Charity number: 1130880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.15m £184.98k £1.09m £574.70k £500.95k
Total expenditure £89.46k £96.05k £114.67k £110.37k £178.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.00m N/A £900.00k £350.00k £240.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £147.76k N/A £188.97k £223.32k £250.25k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £881 N/A £49 £1.38k £10.71k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.85k N/A £114.67k £110.37k £178.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds £77.61k N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.85k N/A £5.53k £8.50k £7.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £71.73k N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0