Accounts and annual returns JOURNALISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1133574
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 27 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 27 May 2013 208 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 29 March 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required