Accounts and annual returns ZONE 7 HOME EDUCATION

Charity Number: 1136296
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 11 March 2014 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 11 March 2014 496 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 14 January 2014 440 days late
Annual return 31 December 2010 16 January 2012 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 16 January 2012 77 days late