Accounts and annual returns STACEY BUSHES MEETING PLACE LIMITED

Charity number: 1128057
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 May 2024 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 March 2023 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 March 2023 57 days late
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required