Financial history THE WILLOWS CENTRE

Charity number: 1129039
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £2.80k £1.75k £812 £1.85k £3.53k
Total expenditure £2.44k £2.28k £2.82k £3.49k £1.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A