Financial history INDIAN ORPHAN RELIEF FUND KGF

Charity number: 1128775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £240 £655 £250 £240 £240
Total expenditure £0 £0 £1.04k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A