Financial history DORCHESTER AMATEUR BOXING CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1129411
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £5.14k £8.47k £4.87k £11.96k £2.89k
Total expenditure £5.23k £4.29k £3.89k £3.83k £5.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A