Financial history FRIENDS OF BEAUMONT PARK LTD

Charity Number: 1129268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £54.59k £31.39k £39.48k £46.28k £41.99k
Total expenditure £42.36k £96.64k £17.38k £23.24k £27.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A