Accounts and annual returns WORKPLACE INSPIRED

Charity number: 1129225
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2011 25 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 25 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 21 January 2011 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required