Financial history MERSEYSIDE BLACK HISTORY MONTH GROUP

Charity Number: 1130104
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £66.72k £41.00k £47.71k £42 £0
Total expenditure £62.62k £50.65k £26.79k £99 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0