Accounts and annual returns DALKEY ARCHIVE PRESS UK

Charity number: 1129760
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2011 10 July 2012 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not submitted