Financial history THE GLOBE PLAYERS LTD

Charity Number: 1131332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £135.33k £94.34k £207.80k £177.27k £266.68k
Total expenditure £133.40k £95.70k £145.95k £195.12k £255.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £11.79k N/A N/A