Financial history GUJARATI CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1129962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.96k £8.69k £17.19k £18.42k £34.84k
Total expenditure £14.34k £7.51k £8.82k £15.23k £23.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A