Financial history RCCG LIVING WORD- DARLINGTON

Charity Number: 1130032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £39.92k £47.92k £56.07k £69.09k £92.89k
Total expenditure £37.94k £33.52k £36.87k £38.88k £53.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A