Financial history ALVERBRIDGE NURSERY

Charity Number: 1130467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £498.76k £522.77k £556.11k £535.27k £603.14k
Total expenditure £474.69k £490.99k £545.33k £567.13k £611.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £339.99k £294.05k £280.51k £281.72k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £339.99k £294.05k £281.01k £281.72k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £776 £904 £4.86k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £181.07k £260.67k £252.41k £313.60k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £937 £613 £944 £2.96k
Income - Other N/A £766 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £488.57k £540.53k £558.07k £608.10k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £833 £3.01k £4.32k £3.18k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £3.12k £0 £0 £6.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £1.59k £1.78k £4.75k £636