Financial history SMART KIDS CHILDCARE

Charity number: 1131945
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £371.39k £433.49k £397.90k £369.74k £324.88k
Total expenditure £378.19k £365.33k £349.76k £379.42k £275.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £66.34k £10.00k £116.03k £101.75k £76.32k