Financial history ART OF LIVING FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity number: 1131480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £63.23k £20.98k £4.63k £32.60k £131.66k
Total expenditure £61.86k £21.51k £9.00k £29.00k £132.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A