Financial history CROSS POLLINATE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1131587
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015
Total gross income £148.10k £126.37k £120.82k £93.94k £93.61k
Total expenditure £144.90k £144.33k £118.28k £100.24k £93.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0