Financial history CHILD FIRST (UK)

Charity number: 1132597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £61.10k £82.03k £51.05k £33.09k £86.64k
Total expenditure £63.02k £85.49k £53.22k £24.52k £42.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A