Financial history HEALING ON THE STREETS BATH

Charity number: 1133098
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £40.21k £42.22k £28.84k £2.10k £1.81k
Total expenditure £40.47k £37.11k £28.24k £1.45k £778
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A