Financial history FOUNTAIN OF HOSANNA CHURCH OF CHRIST

Charity number: 1136572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/04/2020 15/04/2021 15/04/2022 15/04/2023 15/04/2024
Total gross income £2.59k £100 £106 £3.07k £3.88k
Total expenditure £1.90k £100 £100 £3.66k £2.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A