Financial history HIGHAMS PARK COUNSELLING

Charity number: 1137727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £49.79k £62.36k £74.72k £84.68k £38.20k
Total expenditure £50.95k £62.80k £78.33k £78.66k £39.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A