Trustees 8TH GREENFORD (HORSENDEN) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1132609
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Folashade Fabusuyi | Chair | 20 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Wright | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malgorzata Saiz | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ramneek Bhinder | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Botros | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sukhjivan Bhinder | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Reynolds | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jasjeet Bhinder | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Catherine Appleby | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUTH TREMAIN | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Worsley | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bhavesh Patel | Trustee | 15 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Jones | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Appleby | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.