Accounts and annual returns REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - HOUSE OF PRAISE BIRMINGHAM

Charity number: 1133647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 April 2025 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 February 2025 376 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 February 2023 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 February 2022 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required