Accounts and annual returns LIFE CHILD

Charity number: 1133317
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 February 2017 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 08 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 31 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 31 October 2014 On Time