Financial history HAZRAT RUKUN UD DIN TRUST UK

Charity number: 1136819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.32k £30.09k £27.13k £25.51k £22.53k
Total expenditure £3.00k £5.58k £11.46k £7.12k £12.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A