Accounts and annual returns MOUNTAIN MOVERS CHAPEL INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1133168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 08 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 31 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 July 2021 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 27 July 2021 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 July 2020 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 July 2020 8 days late Download Open in new window