Accounts and annual returns TIME LIFE CARE LTD

Charity number: 1133999
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2011 22 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2010 29 November 2011 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2010 Not Required