Financial history DONCASTER METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1134251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £656.73k £259.04k £325.68k £662.63k £448.76k
Total expenditure £374.20k £400.69k £438.47k £493.50k £422.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £14.60k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £104.00k N/A N/A £140 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £317.00k N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £31.00k N/A N/A £48.89k N/A
Income - Other £204.00k N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £374.14k N/A N/A £492.87k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £58 N/A N/A £622 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £471.76k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £21.11k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £622 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A