Accounts and annual returns CHILD LANKA ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1135859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 August 2024 276 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 August 2024 641 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 August 2024 1006 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required