Financial history MACCLESFIELD FC COMMUNITY SPORTS TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1136526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £161.23k £110.47k £84.92k £147.69k £132.26k
Total expenditure £144.10k £131.48k £111.55k £127.88k £148.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.33k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.00k N/A N/A