Financial history THE ELIZABETH EYRE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1134061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £110 £120 £241 £314 £100
Total expenditure £0 £185 £15 £314 £55
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A