Financial history ASSOCIATION FOR COGNITIVE ANALYTIC THERAPY LTD

Charity number: 1141793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £248.88k £214.09k £353.64k £302.32k £282.44k
Total expenditure £262.82k £198.45k £279.74k £279.95k £330.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A