Accounts and annual returns HERMITAGE MILL

Charity number: 1136279
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2016 03 June 2018 308 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required