Financial history THE CHARLOTTE HARTEY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1136042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.60k £11.57k £1.62k £1.75k £4.97k
Total expenditure £4.94k £13.03k £1.85k £3.93k £600
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A