Trustees AMICI BRUERNI
Charity Number: 1135207

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Speroni | Chair | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
EUGENIE VON HANIEL | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
LEO DOUGLAS RYAN | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Playfair | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Charles Wright | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Courtenay Wright | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth McKeon | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Gerald Buchanan Cairns | Trustee | 21 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sean James William Crosky | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Bolten | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Mairead Elizabeth Wren | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.