Accounts and annual returns AUTONOMOUS RESEARCH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1137503
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 November 2020 292 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 November 2020 292 days late
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 January 2018 On Time