Accounts and annual returns NICHOLAS BRANSTON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1140444
Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 19 February 2024 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 22 August 2022 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 03 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 03 April 2021 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required