Trustees COLLEGE OF MENTAL HEALTH PHARMACY
Charity number: 1141467

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSALIND EMILY GITTINS | Chair | 18 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Louise Revell | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jaspreet Sohal | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Bongkwati Navti | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Evans | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Orla Macdonald | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Amanda Jane Wheeler | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yogita Dawda | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Louise Greenhalgh | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abiola Allinson | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tara Lian Gallagher | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Dixon | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Petra Florence Brown | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kiran Hewitt | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAREN SHUKER | Trustee | 18 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ciara Ni Dhubhlaing | Trustee | 13 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.