Accounts and annual returns BETHEL HOUSE FAMILY MISSION (GLORY FAMILY CHURCH)

Charity number: 1143236
Charity reporting is up to date (115 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 24 December 2024 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 24 December 2024 481 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 24 December 2024 846 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 02 September 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 03 August 2021 337 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required