Accounts and annual returns SALVATION EVANGELISM MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1137748
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 May 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 25 May 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 25 May 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 25 May 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 25 May 2012 11 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 May 2012 Not Required
Annual return 24 May 2011 24 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2011 Not Required